Trustees THE SYCHDYN MEMORIAL INSTITUTE
Charity number: 513911
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HAYDN BATEMAN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Rose Parker | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hayley Wynne | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Steven John Pitts | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Walker | Trustee | 09 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Valentine Owen | Trustee | 17 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mari Raynor | Trustee | 01 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
GRENVILLE JONES | Trustee | 01 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
MARION BATEMAN | Trustee | 27 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN KAVANAGH | Trustee | 27 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
GENIA EILEEN FINLAY | Trustee | 14 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
ALAN WATKIN | Trustee |
|
||||||
PAULINE LAWTON-HUGHES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTOPHER ROBERT RUDDLE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.