Trustees DIGITAL ADVANTAGE
Charity number: 1188836
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ashley Boroda | Chair | 06 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Philip Arnold | Trustee | 08 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Beck Cromack-House | Trustee | 06 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Diane Ainsworth | Trustee | 05 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Jane Musique-Hargreaves | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL ANTHONY MCNAMARA | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|||||
KATE DODD | Trustee | 07 April 2020 |
|
|||||
Naomi Timperley | Trustee | 06 June 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.