Trustees THE MILLAR CHARITY FUND
Charity number: 514381
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
POLLY ANDREWS | Chair |
|
||||||||||
Debbie Hobbs | Trustee | 14 June 2023 |
|
|||||||||
Denis Brian Wilcox | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|||||||||
Catherine Hornsey | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|||||||||
David Ludwig Howerski | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|||||||||
Elizabeth Foxton | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|||||||||
David Fleet | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|||||||||
Paul Morris | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|||||||||
Susan Boulter | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|||||||||
Marian Hawkes | Trustee | 01 May 2015 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.