Trustees SOUTHWARK COMMUNITY EDUCATION CHARITY ("SCEC")
Charity number: 1185489
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alexandra Cambouris | Chair | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kerri-Anne Bahth | Trustee | 07 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Teresa Lunnon BA Hons | Trustee | 05 February 2021 |
|
|||||
Rhona Elizabeth Muir MA MSc MA | Trustee | 10 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
HELEN INGHAM BSc | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|||||
Neil Green BEd | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr CAMERON SAMUEL BENJAMIN PYKE MA PhD | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Toby Giles Anderson Griffiths MA DPhil | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Simpson MA | Trustee | 01 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
SUZANNE SAULLO | Trustee | 01 September 1994 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.