Trustees SHREE RAM MANDIR (WALSALL)
Charity number: 514652
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
27 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kartik Bhatt | Trustee | 06 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Bhuvnesh Shah | Trustee | 06 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kamal Shah | Trustee | 06 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rachit Shah | Trustee | 06 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Krupaben Kiranbhai Patel | Trustee | 20 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sunita Patel | Trustee | 19 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Madhukanta Sanjay Patel | Trustee | 09 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jayantilal B Patel | Trustee | 18 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Krishna Patel | Trustee | 18 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Narshibhai PATEL | Trustee | 18 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Gulabbhai C Patel | Trustee | 18 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Shardaben Patel | Trustee | 18 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Bipin H Patel | Trustee | 18 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
MR VASANT MISTRY ACIB, GRADICSA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR N M PATEL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MAHENDRABHAI BALUBHAI LAD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUMANBHAI C PATEL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR M S PATEL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR MORARJI PATEL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PARVATIBEN BHULABHAI PATEL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR PRAVIN PATEL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BALU DAHYA MISTRY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR PRAVIN RANA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR K B PATEL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MANIBEN AMRATLAL PATEL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JAGUBHAI N PATEL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LAXMIBEN SHANTILAL PATEL | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.