Trustees THAME YOUTH PROJECTS GROUP (CIO)
Charity number: 1187553
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LINDA JANE NEWTON | Chair | 24 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Linda Clare Smith | Trustee | 10 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Georgina Welford | Trustee | 10 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alexander MIchael Pazik | Trustee | 20 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christine Ann Bruce-Morgan | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gwilym John Savell | Trustee | 24 January 2020 |
|
|||||
Helena Mary Fickling | Trustee | 24 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul Francis Cowell | Trustee | 24 January 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.