Trustees BUSY FINGERS PRE-SCHOOL
Charity number: 1188632
Charity reporting is up to date (162 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cheryl Steeple | Trustee | 06 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Hazell | Trustee | 26 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emily Dunnett | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
AMANDA OGILVIE | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emily Finney | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Holly Hodge | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amy Tatum | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Winkworth | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Danielle Smith | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.