Trustees THE CAMBRIDGE ROYAL ALBERT HOMES
Charity number: 1190144
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard James Peachey | Chair | 27 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martyn Gordon Ambury | Trustee | 06 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Louise Topel | Trustee | 21 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Philip Conrad | Trustee | 27 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Greenbank | Trustee | 28 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Graham Handley | Trustee | 28 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kate McCorquodale | Trustee | 30 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ann Bullock | Trustee | 20 June 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.