Trustees DONCASTER ST MARY PCC
Charity number: 1189575
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Andrew Robert Thomas | Chair | 20 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Onyekachukwu Ijeh | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joshua Mark O'Leary | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Coryn Jean Vernon | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mark Jonathan Wilson | Trustee | 05 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alison Louise Sayers-Flood | Trustee | 15 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Frederick Wood Hobbs | Trustee | 15 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Richard Flood | Trustee | 15 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Craig Taylor | Trustee | 08 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Diana Rankine | Trustee | 16 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Moira Johnson | Trustee | 16 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Anne Neill | Trustee | 16 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Richard Johnson | Trustee | 16 March 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.