Trustees SOUND PROGRESSION LTD
Charity number: 1190897
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Matthew Alexander Parry | Chair | 22 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Jean Lima | Trustee | 21 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Marcelle Louisa dos Santos | Trustee | 21 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Cian Ciaran | Trustee | 22 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gerald Kuzhangaira | Trustee | 17 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ian John Llewelyn McAndrew | Trustee | 24 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Emma Clark | Trustee | 24 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Kenneth Luxton | Trustee | 10 June 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.