Accounts and annual returns GAZELLE HELICOPTER TRUST
Charity number: 1190678
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 July 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 111 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 July 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 111 days | |
Annual return | 30 July 2022 | 13 July 2023 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 July 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 477 days | |
Annual return | 30 July 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 July 2021 | 01 September 2022 | 94 days late |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window