Trustees SANDYLANDS SPORTS CENTRE
Charity number: 515760
Charity reporting is up to date (25 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LESLIE VILES | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Adam Cox | Trustee | 26 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ji Mukherjee | Trustee | 26 November 2019 |
|
|||||
Darren Shaw | Trustee | 26 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Bev Bruce | Trustee | 26 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Clive Carroll | Trustee | 26 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Warren Burnett | Trustee | 06 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Gary Calam | Trustee | 12 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
Roger Beck | Trustee | 21 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Peter Wilkinson | Trustee | 12 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER HARBRON | Trustee |
|
||||||
TREVOR HOWSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDREW SOLLOWAY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.