Trustees LAWYERS AGAINST POVERTY
Charity number: 1189586
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Omar Madhloom | Trustee | 02 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Adrian John Henderson | Trustee | 02 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Louise Mary Curd | Trustee | 05 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Spencer Mark Simmons | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Caroline Ndindi | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Rose Arthur Elliott LLM | Trustee | 04 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anna Elizabeth Kirkpatrick | Trustee | 04 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kirsty Helen Wilson | Trustee | 04 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Pascale Evelyn Genevieve Bird | Trustee | 04 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Francis Richard Ross Dyton LLM, MSc | Trustee | 04 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN STIRLING SAUNDERS | Trustee | 20 March 2020 |
|
|||||
NAOMI ANNE PASSMAN | Trustee | 20 March 2020 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.