Trustees THE COMMUNITY OF HOPEWEAVERS
Charity number: 1191614
Charity reporting is up to date (9 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philippa Jane Mills | Chair | 14 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Helen Mitchell | Trustee | 17 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ann Heather Spooner | Trustee | 11 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Angela Rena Collins | Trustee | 11 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Kia Pakenham | Trustee | 11 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Sue Halliday | Trustee | 20 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Mary Leppitt | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Margaret Lambert | Trustee | 14 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul Godfrey Leppitt | Trustee | 14 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul Edward Lambert | Trustee | 14 March 2020 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.