LEBE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We support Black, Asian and Minority Ethnic people who have diabetes complicated by other related illnesses. We promote secondary prevention activities that help detect these illnesses early, annd prevent them from getting worse. These activities include attending medical exams and screening tests.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 06 August 2021
People
7 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Liverpool City
Governance
- 07 August 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr KANAYO FREDERICK UMEH | Chair | 07 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
OBIAJULU UMUNNA | Trustee | 25 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jo-Anne Puddephatt | Trustee | 12 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Julie Abayomi | Trustee | 05 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr SAMANTHA JANE BROOKS | Trustee | 03 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Obiageli Francisca Ikeme-Umeh | Trustee | 07 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sunday Adaji | Trustee | 07 August 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 06/08/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 06 August 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 46 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 August 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 46 days | |
Annual return | 06 August 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 412 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 August 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 412 days | |
Annual return | 06 August 2021 | 10 July 2022 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 August 2021 | 10 July 2022 | 34 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 07 Aug 2020
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PROMOTION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH AMONGST BAME (BLACK, ASIAN, AND MINORITY ETHNIC) INDIVIDUALS SUFFERING FROM DIABETES AND WHO ARE ALSO MULTIMORBID OR ARE AT RISK OF BECOMING MULTIMORBID, THROUGH: • THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT GROUPS AND SUCH OTHER ACTIVITIES, SERVICES, ADVICE AND INFORMATION AS THE TRUSTEES DEEM FIT WITH THE AIM OF FACILITATING THE BEST POSSIBLE CARE OF SUCH PERSONS; • THE UNDERTAKING AND FUNDING OF RESEARCH INTO MULTIMORBIDITY, INCLUDING RESEARCH IN HOW TO DETECT MULTIMORBIDITY, AND RESEARCH INTO TREATMENTS OR INTERVENTIONS FOR MULTIMORBIDITY, THE USEFUL RESULTS OF WHICH WILL BE PUBLISHED FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT; AND • THE DEVELOPMENT OF EVIDENCE-BASED TOOLS TO SUPPORT RESEARCH, OR HELP RAISE AWARENESS OF, DETECT, AND/OR PREVENT MULTIMORBIDITY IN BAME PATIENTS. FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS CLAUSE MULTIMORBID IS DEFINED AS FOLLOWS: THE CO-EXISTENCE OF TWO OR MORE CHRONIC CONDITIONS, EACH ONE OF WHICH IS EITHER: • A PHYSICAL NON-COMMUNICABLE DISEASE OF LONG DURATION, SUCH AS A CARDIOVASCULAR DISEASE OR CANCER. • A MENTAL HEALTH CONDITION OF LONG DURATION, SUCH AS A MOOD DISORDER OR DEMENTIA. • AN INFECTIOUS DISEASE OF LONG DURATION, SUCH AS HIV OR HEPATITIS C.
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 ELLIOTT DRIVE
KIRKBY
LIVERPOOL
L32 9SS
- Phone:
- 07542043619
- Email:
- info@lebetrust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window