Governing document CHRIST APOSTOLIC MISSION CHURCH - MOUNT OF SALVATION LTD
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17 DEC 2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11 NOV 2019 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 05 DEC 2019 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23 SEP 2020 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 30 SEP 2020
Charitable objects
1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF CHRISTIAN FAITH IN UNITED KINGDOM AND WORLDWIDE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES SET OUT IN THE STATEMENT OF FAITH CONTAINED IN THE SCHEDULE. 2) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY BY PROVIDING GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.