Trustees ELTHAM PARK BAPTIST CHURCH
Charity number: 1190789
Charity reporting is overdue by 256 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Arnold Tarling | Trustee | 25 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Mary Bailey-Barclay | Trustee | 25 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alfred Bassah | Trustee | 17 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Nobbs | Trustee | 15 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jill Rackley | Trustee | 15 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Heather Goldsworthy | Trustee | 25 June 2017 |
|
|||||
Rachel Priddle | Trustee | 03 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Goldsworthy | Trustee | 01 July 2006 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.