Governing document FLOWERS NORTH WEST
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 OCTOBER 1985 AS AMENDED OCTOBER 1992, 31 OCTOBER 1994, 30 OCTOBER 1995, 11 NOVEMBER 2002 AND 12 NOVEMBER 2007 AS AMENDED ON 25 SEP 2017
Charitable objects
THE AIMS OF THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE ART OF FLOWER ARRANGING AND RELATED SUBJECTS IN THE NORTH WEST AND TO FURTHER ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES.
Area of benefit
CUMBRIA, LANCASHIRE, GREATER MANCHESTER, MERSEYSIDE (EXCLUDING THE AREA WEST OF THE MERSEY) AND THE ISLE OF MAN
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.