Accounts and annual returns WILLINGTON VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 517481
Charity reporting is overdue by 1145 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 49 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 49 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 415 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 415 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 780 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 780 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 1145 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 29 April 2021 | 273 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window