Trustees QUEEN MARGARET'S SCHOOL, YORK LIMITED
Charity number: 517523
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Douglas John Scott Cochran | Trustee | 23 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Fang Shi | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah-Jane Barker | Trustee | 28 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Emma Marie Henney | Trustee | 28 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Terence William Burt | Trustee | 29 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas William Granville Blythe | Trustee | 07 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Stripe | Trustee | 25 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Chloe Alice Fairley | Trustee | 25 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
The Hon Mrs Bel Forbes | Trustee | 19 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
John Hoddinott | Trustee | 19 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mrs Sue King | Trustee | 26 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Clare Deborah Granger | Trustee | 27 March 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.