Trustees NUNEATON ARTS CIO
Charity number: 1193774
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David John Griffith | Chair | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Callum Monaghan | Trustee | 27 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Jean Markham | Trustee | 14 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael James Green | Trustee | 14 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher David Hill | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nathaneal Smith | Trustee | 31 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Louise Johnson | Trustee | 09 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Adams | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael Colin Chappell | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Richard Deeming | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rhian Margaret Luke | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Philip James Malkin | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Antony Sedgwick | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nathan Mark Harvey | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.