Governing document HANSEL AND GRETEL SUPPORT GROUP
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 OCTOBER 1972 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTIONS OF 10 NOVEMBER 1980, 5 JANUARY 1987 AND 6 DECEMBER 2006 AND BY ORDER OF 29 DECEMBER 2006.
Charitable objects
TO PROTECT AND PRESERVE THE MENTAL AND PHYSICAL HEALTH OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS IN TRANSITION TO ADULT LIFE, WITH DISABILITIES AND/OR SPECIAL NEEDS, WHO LIVE IN OR RECEIVE TREATMENT, EDUCATION OR OTHER CARE IN THE WYRE FOREST AREA, AND THAT OF THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS, BY EDUCATING, ADVISING OR ASSISTING PARENTS AND CARERS IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING DEVELOPMENT OF MUTUAL SUPPORT NETWORKS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED, IN PRACTICE WYRE FOREST
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.