Trustees THE STEP UP PRE-SCHOOL
Charity number: 1195100
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ellie Lloyd | Trustee | 06 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Clarkson | Trustee | 08 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Smith | Trustee | 09 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Marie Knott | Trustee | 19 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Brooke | Trustee | 21 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hayley Bottomley | Trustee | 21 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jill Brigham | Trustee | 21 February 2022 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.