Trustees THE ARMY CATERING TRAINING TRUST
Charity number: 1197606
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lieutenant Colonel Marcus Richard Appleton | Chair | 30 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Helen Carney | Trustee | 29 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Wharton | Trustee | 27 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Jones | Trustee | 02 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
SSgt Michele Elaine Hunter RLC | Trustee | 09 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Major Javed Esmail Johl RLC | Trustee | 20 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martin Raymond Foulds RLC | Trustee | 06 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Captain Pawan Sherchan QOGLR | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jamie Russell Webb-Fryer | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Darrin Karl Sinclair | Trustee | 30 September 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.