Trustees THE WILTSHIRE FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S INSTITUTES
Charity number: 1197142
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth Mary Lawer | Chair | 16 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Shauna Bodman | Trustee | 17 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Hosking | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN HINTON | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anna Zebedee-Hardy | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Pamela Ann Loosmore | Trustee | 16 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Gibson-Piggott | Trustee | 16 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Louise Ann Hall | Trustee | 16 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Susan Holdway | Trustee | 16 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Theresa Chapman | Trustee | 16 December 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.