Trustees SHIRLEY BAPTIST CHURCH, SOLIHULL
Charity number: 1197996
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicholas Arthur Carter | Trustee | 15 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Sofia Waghmare | Trustee | 15 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Vlamir Reis | Trustee | 15 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Helen Jane Read | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Uday Chinnathambi | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Rev Matthew Lloyd Wilson | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|||||
Christopher Jones | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|||||
DAVID ANDREW ROSE | Trustee | 21 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Neil Ronald Aston | Trustee | 21 February 2022 |
|
|||||
Peter John Close | Trustee | 21 February 2022 |
|
|||||
Stuart Alexander Fisher | Trustee | 21 February 2022 |
|
|||||
Lynne Russell | Trustee | 21 February 2022 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.