Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST ANDREW'S AND ST PETER'S, SOUTH SHOEBURY
Charity number: 1198044
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev LOUISE MARGARET WILLIAMS | Chair | 24 November 2010 |
|
|
||||
Debra Susan Slack | Trustee | 10 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Harrison Thomas | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Max Gary Barnes | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Phipps | Trustee | 22 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Denise Askew | Trustee | 30 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Gerrard Dromgoole | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey George Price | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Geraldine Rebecca Hansford | Trustee | 19 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Elizabeth Baines | Trustee | 30 April 1998 |
|
|
||||
Andrew John Clipsham | Trustee | 15 April 1995 |
|
|
||||
Keith Thomas Barham | Trustee | 30 April 1993 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.