Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HORNDON, ORSETT AND BULPHAN
Charity number: 1199779
Recently registered
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Susan Mary Mann | Chair | 03 March 2016 |
|
|||||
Beverley Jill Macrae | Trustee | 02 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Felicity Nora Tarbard | Trustee | 30 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Louise Bennett | Trustee | 30 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Ann Robertson | Trustee | 30 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Irene Billinger | Trustee | 30 January 2022 |
|
|||||
David Foster Mortimer | Trustee | 19 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christine Louise Mortimer | Trustee | 19 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alastair Alan John Folan Macrae | Trustee | 30 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sonia Anne Ward | Trustee | 30 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Ronald David Porter | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Janet Veronica Wilkins | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Frank Edward Stanley Woollard | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Karen Jean Collier | Trustee | 20 September 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.