Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WADSLEY
Charity number: 1201233
Recently registered
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Daniel Brown B.A., M.A. | Chair | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jeremy Henry James Bates | Trustee | 18 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Brian John Vivian | Trustee | 18 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Heron | Trustee | 20 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jenifer Jackson | Trustee | 20 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joan Sargison | Trustee | 20 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katie Grindrod | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Hutty | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
REV REBECCA RUTH OTIENO | Trustee | 10 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emily Rebekah Kittle | Trustee | 02 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Snook | Trustee | 06 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Donna Merry | Trustee | 04 April 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.