Trustees DOOR 84
Charity number: 1203574
Recently registered
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Laura Jane Castle | Trustee | 28 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Antony Smith | Trustee | 15 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anda Baraskina | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Clarkson | Trustee | 12 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Carole Pugh | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Amy Bates | Trustee | 15 January 2021 |
|
|||||
Dennis Adamson | Trustee | 17 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
JOHN NIKLAUS | Trustee | 10 November 2010 |
|
|||||
BRIAN HOUGHTON | Trustee | 10 November 2009 |
|
|||||
Sheelagh Salter | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.