Trustees 1ST NEWTON AYCLIFFE SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 520696
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David English | Chair | 16 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Graeme Copland | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ryan Larcombe | Trustee | 05 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Hutchinson | Trustee | 05 April 2020 |
|
|||||
Gary Jukes | Trustee | 23 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Provan | Trustee | 17 December 2013 |
|
|||||
Derek Ranald John Provan | Trustee | 17 December 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.