Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WIGAN WEST
Charity number: 1201671
Recently registered
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
32 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JEFFREY JAMES MCCANN | Trustee | 03 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev Elliott John Ireton | Trustee | 30 October 2021 |
|
|||||||||
Rev Susan Yvonne Fulford | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|||||||||
ANDREW BOND | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev Stephen Andrew Beck | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|||||||||
SHEILA LESLEY ALBERS | Trustee | 04 February 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
ANGELA MICHELE MATTHEWSON | Trustee | 09 January 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
ANN BIRCH | Trustee | 09 January 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
CLIFFORD UNSWORTH | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev Dorothy Grace Gosling | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|||||||||
Rev Samantha Louise Nicholson | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|||||||||
Rev Stanley Anthony Higginson | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|||||||||
Rev Mark John Wade | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|||||||||
Rev Neil John Cook | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|||||||||
Rev JEREMY PAUL THOMAS | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|||||||||
Kathleen Moran | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|||||||||
REV David Martin Brooke | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|||||||||
Rev William Jacob Gibbons | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|||||||||
Kathleen Mary Smith | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Gordon Howard James | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
Jessica Ruth Wallace Rusling | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
Louise Gwen Ashcroft | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
Carole Simm | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
Rev Frances Marian Humphry | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
Pamela D Wilkinson | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
Iain Lawrence Matthewson | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
Arthur Martin Gaskell | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
Rev Judith Frances Shoesmith | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
Emma Farley | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
Martin Wood | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
Roger John Clarke | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
Alison Elizabeth Jackson | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.