NEW LONDON COMMUNITY CHOIR
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To improve, develop and maintain public education through choral music in the community, through rehearsing and giving concerts in London and elsewhere and for exchanges with other musical organisations
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 01 June 2023: CIO registration
- CLERKENWELL COMMUNITY CHOIR (Working name)
- ST CLEMENT'S COMMUNITY CHOIR (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Milan Stamenkovic | Chair | 16 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sandrina Carosso | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Adam Dale | Trustee | 04 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul John Turley | Trustee | 04 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Gardiner | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Timothy Kitchin | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Elizabeth James | Trustee | 16 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas David Brittain | Trustee | 16 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kim Maria Caplin | Trustee | 16 January 2023 |
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 01 Jun 2023
Charitable objects
TO IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION THROUGH CHORAL MUSIC IN THE COMMUNITY, THROUGH REHEARSING AND GIVING CONCERTS IN LONDON AND ELSEWHERE AND FOR EXCHANGES WITH OTHER MUSICAL ORGANISATIONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 COOMBS STREET
LONDON
N1 8DJ
- Phone:
- 07984228110
- Email:
- newlondonchoir@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.