Trustees VILLAGE PEOPLE (ALVERSTOKE) WI
Charity number: 1203627
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gaynor Vaughan | Chair | 04 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Marlane Draper | Trustee | 19 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Yeardley | Trustee | 28 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
JANET NORMAN | Trustee | 23 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Linda Dunlop | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Marilyn Francis | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|||||
Una Stock | Trustee | 04 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Joan Kerr | Trustee | 07 October 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.