Trustees BARDNEY VILLAGE HALL AND PLAYING FIELD
Charity number: 521889
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SEAN DEVELERA O'CALLAGHAN | Chair | 12 June 1998 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Horsenail | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Ken Hutchinson | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Papworth Male | Trustee | 29 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
HAYLEY RUANE | Trustee | 09 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Martyn Chambers | Trustee | 09 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
BENJAMIN GREEN | Trustee | 09 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
COLIN TAYLOR | Trustee | 09 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
JANET DENISE TODD | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.