Trustees WOOTTON VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 522012
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Bell | Trustee | 23 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
-- Serena Jayne Walters | Trustee | 23 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Frances Julia Ann Bell | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
SHARRON MITTON | Trustee | 14 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Nunes | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Mary Simpson | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian Gerrard | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Simpson | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laura Galbraith | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.