Trustees ST AIDAN'S COMMUNITY CENTRE ORGANISATION
Charity number: 522040
Charity reporting is up to date (139 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Christopher Down | Trustee | 14 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Margaret Spong | Trustee | 30 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Ollwyn Ann Farrell | Trustee | 30 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Ben Pullan | Trustee | 30 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Julie Seaton | Trustee | 29 June 2016 |
|
|||||
David Spencer | Trustee | 30 September 2014 |
|
|||||
Barrie Todd | Trustee | 31 January 2014 |
|
|||||
Mr Chris Watson | Trustee | 26 June 2013 |
|
|||||
Tracey Gasper | Trustee | 29 June 2012 |
|
|||||
LEIGH GEDDES | Trustee | 30 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr HELEN MARIE WATSON | Trustee |
|
||||||
SUSIE COATES | Trustee |
|
||||||
BRIAN DUELL | Trustee |
|
||||||
JESSICA MARY MCLEAVY CARR | Trustee |
|
||||||
LOUISE ISOBELLE MILLICENT MCGEARY | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.