Trustees ABDON VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 522472
Charity reporting is up to date (106 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARGARET ANNE BUCKINGHAM | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Martin Nigel Steer | Trustee | 24 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon James Josiah Wedgwood | Trustee | 31 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Snow | Trustee | 01 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Jane Unitt | Trustee | 01 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW BALCHIN COLLETT Mr | Trustee | 19 July 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.