Governing document THE SOLIHULL MANOR HOUSE CHARITY
Charity number: 523006
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 6 APRIL 1946 AS AMENDED BY DEEDS OF VARIATION DATED 26 OCTOBER 1962, 25 NOVEMBER 1993, 22 SEPTEMBER 1997 AND 26 JUNE 2007.
Charitable objects
THE TRUST PREMISES TO BE PRESERVED AS A BUILDING OF BEAUTY AND HISTORIC INTEREST, AND TO BE USED FOR RECREATION, EDUCATION, INSTRUCTION, AND SOCIAL AND COMMUNITY PURPOSES.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
SOLIHULL AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.