Accounts and annual returns CEFN COED COMMUNITY CENTRE
Charity number: 523664
Charity reporting is overdue by 596 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 231 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 231 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 596 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 596 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 May 2024 | 840 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 May 2024 | 840 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 March 2024 | 1145 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 March 2024 | 1145 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 22 December 2022 | 1056 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 22 December 2022 | 1056 days late | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window