Trustees THE POPPLETON COMMUNITY TRUST
Charity number: 523984
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Michael Richardson | Trustee | 20 January 2020 |
|
|||||
Allison Kim Campbell | Trustee | 17 June 2019 |
|
|||||
Trevor Lawson | Trustee | 14 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
GEMMA LAWSON | Trustee | 12 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Emma Lawer | Trustee | 12 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mike Walter | Trustee | 12 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Tim Bowers | Trustee | 18 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
June Hardy | Trustee | 18 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL CROME | Trustee | 11 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
WARWICK SPENCER | Trustee | 28 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
ALLEN JONES | Trustee | 21 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
ROBIN TOMLINSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR BOB WOOD | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.