Trustees HUMBERSIDE COUNTY SCOUT COUNCIL
Charity number: 524674
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IAN BIRKINSHAW | Chair | 20 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Teal | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Steve Brownless | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Winter | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Longden | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Breeden | Trustee | 21 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
GARY MCCUNE | Trustee | 27 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Mark David Turner | Trustee | 06 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
ALAN HAYWARD | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.