Trustees GILBERDYKE WAR MEMORIAL HALL AND PLAYING FIELD
Charity number: 525023
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Reynolds | Chair | 13 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Woolass | Trustee | 13 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Josephine Stevens | Trustee | 06 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Taylor-Dunn | Trustee | 06 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
SUE PINKERTON | Trustee | 03 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jeff Pinkerton | Trustee | 10 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
Sue Reynolds | Trustee | 13 July 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.