Governance 1ST YORKS WOOD 229TH BIRMINGHAM SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 525167
Removed charity
Registration history:
- 13 June 1973: Standard registration
- 11 November 2008: Removed (Does not operate)
- 30 July 2009: Standard registration
- 09 October 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 19 March 2012: Re-registered
- 15 January 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.