Governing document THE LIVERPOOL BLUE COAT SCHOOL FOUNDATION
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 31 MAY 1951, AS AMENDED BY SCHEME 29TH FEBRUARY 2000 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTIONS DATED 25 FEBRUARY 2003 AND 23 MARCH 2005 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 22 JUN 2016
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF ITEMS, SERVICES AND FACILITIES FOR THE SCHOOL; THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION OF INDIVIDUALS ATTENDING THE SCHOOL WHO ARE IN NEED; AND THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION OF FORMER PUPILS FROM THE SCHOOL WHO ARE IN NEED
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED, BUT WITH APREFERENC FOR LIVERPOOL BOYS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.