Accounts and annual returns ADA AND MAY DRINKALL PRIZES
Charity number: 526460
Charity reporting is overdue by 804 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 73 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 73 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 439 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 439 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 804 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 804 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 24 March 2021 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 24 March 2021 | 297 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window