Trustees QUEEN ELIZABETH'S FOUNDATION
Charity number: 526600
Charity reporting is up to date (21 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karin Tweedale | Trustee | 21 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
neil coe | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
joanne wilkinson | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
yvonne mills | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
peter haywood | Trustee | 12 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
philip bell | Trustee | 26 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
COLIN MASON | Trustee | 05 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
DAVID LEES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RON HEATH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRENDA SIMPSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALISON CROMPTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HENRY WEST | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GILL CARROLL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROY DAVIES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID ROBERTS HEAD TEACH | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.