Trustees HUTTON CHURCH OF ENGLAND GRAMMAR SCHOOL FOUNDATION
Charity number: 526712
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GRAHAM GOOCH | Chair | 10 May 2011 |
|
|||||
Helen Butterworth | Trustee | 02 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Lang | Trustee | 02 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Green | Trustee | 14 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW EDWARD BALLER | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Jayne Dolloway | Trustee | 10 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian Greenhalgh | Trustee | 12 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Keith Alan Ashcroft | Trustee | 14 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Clark | Trustee | 30 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
REV MATTHEW MCMURRAY | Trustee | 08 February 2017 |
|
|||||
MICHAEL ANSON | Trustee |
|
||||||
PETER ALLEN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.