Trustees COWLEY'S ENDOWED SCHOOLS FOUNDATION
Charity number: 527291
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD WRAY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Simon Charles Walsh | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Cole | Trustee | 22 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul Christian Slater | Trustee | 22 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Wray | Trustee | 14 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mark Rollinson | Trustee | 17 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN PEARSON | Trustee | 14 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
JANE KING | Trustee | 06 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
JANE CATHERINE STANLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS S THOROLD | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.