Accounts and annual returns THE BUCKINGHAM V C MEMORIAL FUND
Charity number: 527903
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 May 2024 | 91 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 May 2024 | 456 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | Overdue | Overdue by 5325 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Overdue | Overdue by 5325 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | Overdue | Overdue by 5690 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Overdue | Overdue by 5690 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | Overdue | Overdue by 6056 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Overdue | Overdue by 6056 days |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window